NY S00624 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-02 - SIGNED CHAP.337
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-02 - SIGNED CHAP.337
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a residential parking system in certain parts of the hamlet of Oceanside in the town of Hempstead.
Title
Authorizes a residential parking system in certain parts of the hamlet of Oceanside in the town of Hempstead.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-02 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.337 |
2021-07-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | home rule request |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.545 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | substituted for a3946 |
2021-03-23 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2021-03-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-03-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-03-23 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2021-02-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-02-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.276 |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A03946 (Same As) 2021-06-08 - substituted by s624