NY S00617 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-21 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-21 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the constitution to delete the requirement that registration for purposes of voting be completed at least ten days before election day and provides that laws be made to adequately safeguard against deception in the exercise of the right of suffrage; enables the legislature to enact legislation permitting persons to register to vote on election day and also to implement adequate safeguards against fraud.
Title
Amends the constitution to delete the requirement that registration for purposes of voting be completed at least ten days before election day and provides that laws be made to adequately safeguard against deception in the exercise of the right of suffrage; enables the legislature to enact legislation permitting persons to register to vote on election day and also to implement adequate safeguards against fraud.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-21 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2014-01-13 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2013-02-06 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2013-01-11 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A00113 (Same As) 2014-02-05 - opinion referred to judiciary