NY S00555 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-23 - VETOED MEMO.70
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-23 - VETOED MEMO.70
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the office of older adult workforce development within the office for the aging to address the needs of older adults regarding the workplace.
Title
Creates the office of older adult workforce development within the office for the aging to address the needs of older adults regarding the workplace.
Sponsors
Sen. Rachel May [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. Samra Brouk [D] | Sen. Jeremy Cooney [D] |
Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Aging Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate Aging Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Aging Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate Aging Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-23 | Senate | VETOED MEMO.70 |
2022-11-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.677 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted for a3403b |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-05-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-04-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.850 |
2022-03-25 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 555C |
2022-03-25 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2022-03-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 555B |
2022-03-09 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2022-02-01 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | referred to aging |
2021-05-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-26 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-04-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-04-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.776 |
2021-01-26 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2021-01-19 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 555A |
2021-01-19 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO AGING |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
Same As/Similar To
A03403 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - substituted by s555c