NY S00536 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5994B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5994B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits clauses restricting certain research and restricts advertisement and promotion of electronic cigarettes.
Title
Prohibits clauses restricting certain research and restricts advertisement and promotion of electronic cigarettes.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Thomas [D] | Sen. Samra Brouk [D] | Sen. Iwen Chu [D] | Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] |
Sen. Robert Jackson [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-08 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5994B |
2023-06-05 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 536A |
2023-06-05 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2023-06-05 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2023-03-27 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2023-03-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-03-27 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-01-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-01-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-01-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.149 |
2023-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A05994 (Same As) 2023-10-25 - signed chap.566