NY S00521 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-24 - PRINT NUMBER 521A
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-24 - PRINT NUMBER 521A
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "fair broadcast employment act of 2018" to authorize the use of certain contract provisions for the employment of key employees in the broadcast industry.
Title
Enacts the "fair broadcast employment act of 2018" to authorize the use of certain contract provisions for the employment of key employees in the broadcast industry.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 521A |
2018-01-24 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2017-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A05102 (Same As) 2018-03-16 - print number 5102a