NY S00508 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION
Pending: Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION
Pending: Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the sheriff to charge prisoners fees to support the operations of the facility where they are incarcerated and requires the inmates of the facility to assist in the provision of necessary services provided at the facility; provides that employees of the correctional facility shall not be subject to adverse employment actions as a result of the section.
Title
Authorizes the sheriff to charge prisoners fees to support the operations of the facility where they are incarcerated and requires the inmates of the facility to assist in the provision of necessary services provided at the facility; provides that employees of the correctional facility shall not be subject to adverse employment actions as a result of the section.
Sponsors
Sen. George Maziarz [R] | Sen. John DeFrancisco [R] | Sen. Michael Nozzolio [R] | Sen. Michael Ranzenhofer [R] |
Sen. James Seward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2011-06-24 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2011-05-16 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 508A |
2011-05-09 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-05-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-05-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.526 |
2011-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A01352 (Same As) 2012-06-05 - held for consideration in correction