NY S00501 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to regulation of toxic chemicals in children's products.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to regulation of toxic chemicals in children's products.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 119 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-04-30Assemblypassed assembly
2019-04-30Assemblyordered to third reading cal.207
2019-04-30Assemblysubstituted for a6296a
2019-04-30Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-04-30SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-04-30SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-04-29SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-04-10Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-04-10SenateAMENDED 501B
2019-04-09Senate1ST REPORT CAL.457
2019-03-28SenatePRINT NUMBER 501A
2019-03-28SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
2019-01-09SenateREFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION

Same As/Similar To

A06296 (Same As) 2019-04-30 - substituted by s501b

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00501&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00501&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S00501
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00501&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S00501A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00501&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S00501B
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S501#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S501#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00501&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback