NY S00487 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-02 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-02 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the court to order sexual offenders on probation, where such probation has been revoked, to terms of imprisonment which run consecutively to sentences already being served.
Title
Authorizes the court to order sexual offenders on probation, where such probation has been revoked, to terms of imprisonment which run consecutively to sentences already being served.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2012-05-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-05-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-04-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-04-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-04-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.572 |
2012-01-18 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2011-02-14 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2011-02-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-02-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-02-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-02-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-02-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.58 |
2011-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |