NY S00482 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows for written instructions regarding elements to be supplied to a jury.
Title
Allows for written instructions regarding elements to be supplied to a jury.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2022-02-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-02-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-01-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-01-19 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.232 |
2022-01-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 482B |
2022-01-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-03-30 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2021-03-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-03-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-03-22 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 482A |
2021-03-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.512 |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A04553 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to codes