NY S00449 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Limits temporary detention of defendants in violation of their release in a local correctional facility to 72 hours before transfer to state custody.
Title
Limits temporary detention of defendants in violation of their release in a local correctional facility to 72 hours before transfer to state custody.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-04-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-04-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.775 |
2018-01-23 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2017-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1839 |
2017-06-06 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-01-30 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |