NY S00448 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-07 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-07 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to increasing penalties for first degree stalking to a class C felony, second degree stalking to a class D felony, third degree stalking to a class E felony, and fourth degree stalking to a class A misdemeanor.
Title
Relates to increasing penalties for first degree stalking to a class C felony, second degree stalking to a class D felony, third degree stalking to a class E felony, and fourth degree stalking to a class A misdemeanor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-07 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2016-06-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-06 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1414 |
2016-06-06 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-03-09 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2015-03-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-03-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-02-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-02-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.59 |
2015-01-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |