NY S00423 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - PRINT NUMBER 423B
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - PRINT NUMBER 423B
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits a liability policy to provide coverage for punitive damages, civil penalties and other non-compensatory damages.
Title
Permits a liability policy to provide coverage for punitive damages, civil penalties and other non-compensatory damages.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 423B |
2018-03-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |
2018-02-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 423A |
2018-02-23 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2017-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A04734 (Same As) 2018-02-02 - print number 4734a