NY A04734 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - print number 4734a
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - print number 4734a
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits a liability policy to provide coverage for punitive damages, civil penalties and other non-compensatory damages.
Title
Permits a liability policy to provide coverage for punitive damages, civil penalties and other non-compensatory damages.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-02 | Assembly | print number 4734a |
2018-02-02 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to insurance |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2017-02-03 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S00423 (Same As) 2018-03-06 - PRINT NUMBER 423B