NY S00406 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO LABOR
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO LABOR
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes certain care and treatment to injured employees receiving workers' compensation benefits; relates to massage therapy services.
Title
Authorizes certain care and treatment to injured employees receiving workers' compensation benefits; relates to massage therapy services.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Robach [R] | Sen. Rich Funke [R] | Sen. Terrence Murphy [R] | Sen. Jose Peralta [D] |
Sen. Patricia Ritchie [R] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2017-06-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 406A |
2017-06-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2017-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A06797 (Same As) 2018-04-17 - REFERRED TO LABOR