NY S00343 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-14 - PRINT NUMBER 343A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-14 - PRINT NUMBER 343A
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a gift for preserving religious landmarks option on state income tax returns; establishes the "preserving religious landmarks fund" into which all revenue from such gifts shall be deposited; monies shall be used to provide annual grants to religious organizations which occupy and use a historic, inner-city house of worship, for the preservation of such houses of worship.
Title
Establishes a gift for preserving religious landmarks option on state income tax returns; establishes the "preserving religious landmarks fund" into which all revenue from such gifts shall be deposited; monies shall be used to provide annual grants to religious organizations which occupy and use a historic, inner-city house of worship, for the preservation of such houses of worship.
Sponsors
Sen. Ruben Diaz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 343A |
2014-01-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A08648 (Same As) 2014-01-30 - referred to ways and means