NY S00309 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-17 - PRINT NUMBER 309A
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-17 - PRINT NUMBER 309A
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a study of the performance of the state's roadways in reducing the risk of motor vehicles departing the travel lane and overturning, or colliding with fixed objects, or colliding with motorized or non-motorized vehicles or pedestrians, or leaving the roadway; further requires the commissioner of transportation and the thruway authority to submit a report to the governor and legislature.
Title
Requires a study of the performance of the state's roadways in reducing the risk of motor vehicles departing the travel lane and overturning, or colliding with fixed objects, or colliding with motorized or non-motorized vehicles or pedestrians, or leaving the roadway; further requires the commissioner of transportation and the thruway authority to submit a report to the governor and legislature.
Sponsors
Sen. Ruben Diaz [D] | Sen. John Sampson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 309A |
2014-01-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A00176 (Same As) 2014-01-22 - print number 176a