NY S00307 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-06 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-06 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for findings of the state board of parole necessary for discretionary release of incarcerated individuals on parole.
Title
Provides for findings of the state board of parole necessary for discretionary release of incarcerated individuals on parole.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-06 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime And Correction Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-06 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2023-05-23 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2023-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A00162 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to codes