NY S00294 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2573A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2573A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Removes the prohibition on individuals convicted of a felony that prevents them from being appointed fiduciary of an estate; allows the court the discretion to permit or prevent such appointment of an individual convicted of a felony.
Title
Removes the prohibition on individuals convicted of a felony that prevents them from being appointed fiduciary of an estate; allows the court the discretion to permit or prevent such appointment of an individual convicted of a felony.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A2573A |
2021-05-11 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 294A |
2021-03-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.522 |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A02573 (Same As) 2021-10-22 - signed chap.486