NY S00261 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3078
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3078
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes earning at least eighteen credits from a program registered by the state education department from a degree-granting higher education institution as a condition on which the merit board may grant merit time.
Title
Includes earning at least eighteen credits from a program registered by the state education department from a degree-granting higher education institution as a condition on which the merit board may grant merit time.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A3078 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.567 |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A03078 (Same As) 2021-07-16 - signed chap.242