NY S00243 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "patient privacy protection act"; prohibits ex-parte interviews of other party's treating physicians or health care providers in personal injury, medical, dental, or podiatric malpractice, or wrongful death actions.
Title
Enacts the "patient privacy protection act"; prohibits ex-parte interviews of other party's treating physicians or health care providers in personal injury, medical, dental, or podiatric malpractice, or wrongful death actions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2017-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A01404 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - enacting clause stricken
A09030 (Same As) 2018-03-01 - advanced to third reading cal.702
A09030 (Same As) 2018-03-01 - advanced to third reading cal.702