NY A09030 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - advanced to third reading cal.702
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - advanced to third reading cal.702
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "patient privacy protection act"; prohibits ex parte interviews of other party's treating physicians or health care providers in personal injury, medical, dental, or podiatric malpractice, or wrongful death actions.
Title
Enacts the "patient privacy protection act"; prohibits ex parte interviews of other party's treating physicians or health care providers in personal injury, medical, dental, or podiatric malpractice, or wrongful death actions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.702 |
2018-02-27 | Assembly | reported |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-01-12 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S00243 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY