NY S00205 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-05 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-05 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits state chartered banking institutions from investing in and providing financing for private prisons.
Title
Prohibits state chartered banking institutions from investing in and providing financing for private prisons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-05 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2024-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-03-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-03-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.587 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2023-05-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-03-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-03-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-02-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.420 |
2023-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
Same As/Similar To
A06601 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.190