NY S00185 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS
Pending: Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS
Pending: Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to rules and regulations of the state; requires recommendations on repealing unnecessary or otherwise burdensome rules and regulations; requires the repeal of such rules or regulations by the governor.
Title
Relates to rules and regulations of the state; requires recommendations on repealing unnecessary or otherwise burdensome rules and regulations; requires the repeal of such rules or regulations by the governor.
Sponsors
Sen. Kathleen Marchione [R] | Sen. John DeFrancisco [R] | Sen. Simcha Felder [D] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] |
Sen. Pamela Helming [R] | Sen. Robert Ortt [R] | Sen. Patricia Ritchie [R] | Sen. James Seward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2017-11-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 185A |
2017-11-08 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2017-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
Same As/Similar To
A05375 (Same As) 2018-04-16 - held for consideration in governmental operations