NY S00184 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes recoupment by the state or any political subdivision of financial incentives such as awards, loans, grants or tax abatements, awarded businesses for purposes of job training, job creation or retention, or the development of business operations, upon recipient's failure to complete the terms of the incentive.
Title
Authorizes recoupment by the state or any political subdivision of financial incentives such as awards, loans, grants or tax abatements, awarded businesses for purposes of job training, job creation or retention, or the development of business operations, upon recipient's failure to complete the terms of the incentive.
Sponsors
Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-04-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.848 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-03-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.453 |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A01349 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to governmental operations