NY S00179 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-20 - PRINT NUMBER 179A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-20 - PRINT NUMBER 179A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to establishing the New York state seniors trust fund and directing certain moneys to be deposited into such fund.
Title
Relates to establishing the New York state seniors trust fund and directing certain moneys to be deposited into such fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Ruben Diaz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 179A |
2016-01-20 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2015-01-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A06668 (Same As) 2016-04-07 - print number 6668a