NY S00179 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-05 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-05 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for payment of bonuses to veterans of the Korean war.
Title
Provides for payment of bonuses to veterans of the Korean war.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2014-03-28 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 179A |
2014-03-28 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2014-02-21 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2014-01-13 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2013-02-06 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2013-01-11 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A00134 (Same As) 2014-05-02 - opinion referred to judiciary