NY S00178 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the office of fire prevention and control to conduct a study, which evaluates the minimum recommended qualifications to becoming a volunteer firefighter; requires such office to provide a report to the governor, temporary president of the senate and the speaker of the assembly within twelve months of the effective date of this act.
Title
Directs the office of fire prevention and control to conduct a study, which evaluates the minimum recommended qualifications to becoming a volunteer firefighter; requires such office to provide a report to the governor, temporary president of the senate and the speaker of the assembly within twelve months of the effective date of this act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-02-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.461 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.714 |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A07956 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to governmental operations