NY S00136 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-07 - referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development
Pending: Assembly Tourism, Parks, Arts and Sports Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-07 - referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development
Pending: Assembly Tourism, Parks, Arts and Sports Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes persons under the age of eighteen to participate in certain organized racing and competitive events involving snowmobiles.
Title
Authorizes persons under the age of eighteen to participate in certain organized racing and competitive events involving snowmobiles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks and Recreation Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-07 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2018-05-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-05-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-01-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.164 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2017-03-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-03-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-02-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-02-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.180 |
2017-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
Same As/Similar To
A04503 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development