NY S00116 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-20 - PRINT NUMBER 116A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-20 - PRINT NUMBER 116A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires cultural awareness and competence training for all medical professionals as part of their licensing requirements; requires biennial training in the non-discriminatory provision of medical services for physicians, physician assistants, dentists, dental hygienists, registered and licensed practical nurses, podiatrists, and optometrists; authorizes the department of education to develop the training in consultation with the department of health and other experts; provides for documentation and exemption from the requirements; provides for a public education program on minority health; appropriates $100,000 therefor.
Title
Requires cultural awareness and competence training for all medical professionals as part of their licensing requirements; requires biennial training in the non-discriminatory provision of medical services for physicians, physician assistants, dentists, dental hygienists, registered and licensed practical nurses, podiatrists, and optometrists; authorizes the department of education to develop the training in consultation with the department of health and other experts; provides for documentation and exemption from the requirements; provides for a public education program on minority health; appropriates $100,000 therefor.
Sponsors
Sen. Ruben Diaz [D] | Sen. Bill Perkins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 116A |
2016-01-20 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2015-01-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A06679 (Same As) 2016-04-07 - print number 6679a