NY S00116 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-05 - PRINT NUMBER 116A
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-05 - PRINT NUMBER 116A
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to prostitution offenses; creates the new crimes of unlawful prostitution and sexual exploitation of a child.
Title
Relates to prostitution offenses; creates the new crimes of unlawful prostitution and sexual exploitation of a child.
Sponsors
Sen. Ruben Diaz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 116A |
2012-01-05 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2011-03-31 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO JUDICIARY |
2011-02-22 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2011-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |