NY S00088 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-11 - PRINT NUMBER 88A
Pending: Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-11 - PRINT NUMBER 88A
Pending: Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Recodifies the small business innovation research program within the New York state urban development corporation act; alters provisions under the small business innovation research program particularly as they affect Phase I award winners; prohibits arbitrary exclusion of technologies and companies; provides for matching of federal funds, to a certain extent.
Title
Recodifies the small business innovation research program within the New York state urban development corporation act; alters provisions under the small business innovation research program particularly as they affect Phase I award winners; prohibits arbitrary exclusion of technologies and companies; provides for matching of federal funds, to a certain extent.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 88A |
2016-01-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2015-01-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A04408 (Same As) 2016-05-04 - reported referred to ways and means