NY S00017 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for regulation of sports betting and mobile sports wagering; defines terms; implements a tax equivalent to eight and one-half percent of sports wagering gross revenue; requires reporting; provides for civil penalties for violations; makes related provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for regulation of sports betting and mobile sports wagering; defines terms; implements a tax equivalent to eight and one-half percent of sports wagering gross revenue; requires reporting; provides for civil penalties for violations; makes related provisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Racing, Gaming and Wagering Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Racing, Gaming and Wagering Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-13SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2020-01-08SenateREFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING
2020-01-08Assemblyreturned to senate
2020-01-08Assemblydied in assembly
2019-06-17Assemblyreferred to codes
2019-06-17SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-17SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-17SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1408
2019-06-17SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-06-14SenatePRINT NUMBER 17D
2019-06-14SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE
2019-06-11SenatePRINT NUMBER 17C
2019-06-11SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE
2019-06-05SenatePRINT NUMBER 17B
2019-06-05SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE
2019-05-13SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2019-05-02SenatePRINT NUMBER 17A
2019-05-02SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING
2019-01-09SenateREFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING

Same As/Similar To

A06113 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to codes

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00017&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00017&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S00017
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00017&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S00017A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00017&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S00017B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00017&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S00017C
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S00017&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S00017D
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S17#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S17#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S17#SC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S17#SC3

Bill Comments

feedback