NY S00016 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A431C
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A431C
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to establishing restrictions on the sale of over-the-counter diet pills and dietary supplements for weight loss or muscle building; prohibits the sale of over-the-counter diet pills or dietary supplements for weight loss or muscle building to people under 18 unless properly prescribed by a health care provider; exempts certain protein powders, protein drinks and foods.
Title
Relates to establishing restrictions on the sale of over-the-counter diet pills and dietary supplements for weight loss or muscle building; prohibits the sale of over-the-counter diet pills or dietary supplements for weight loss or muscle building to people under 18 unless properly prescribed by a health care provider; exempts certain protein powders, protein drinks and foods.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A431C |
2022-03-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-03-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.624 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.407 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | substituted for a431c |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2021-06-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-02 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1395 |
2021-06-02 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-06-01 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 16D |
2021-06-01 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2021-05-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 16C |
2021-05-17 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2021-05-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 16B |
2021-05-05 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2021-03-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 16A |
2021-03-03 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2021-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A00431 (Same As) 2021-06-07 - substituted by s16d