NY A03525 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 64-6)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-03 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for the labeling of raw agriculture commodities, processed foods, seed, and seed stock produced with genetic engineering; defines terms; imposes penalties for false labels and misbranding; sets forth exemptions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the labeling of raw agriculture commodities, processed foods, seed, and seed stock produced with genetic engineering; defines terms; imposes penalties for false labels and misbranding; sets forth exemptions.

Sponsors

Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D]Asm. Crystal Peoples-Stokes [D]Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D]Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D]
Asm. Fred Thiele [D]Asm. Michael Kearns [D]Asm. Luis Sepulveda [D]Asm. Samuel Roberts [D]
Asm. Francisco Moya [D]Asm. Charles Lavine [D]Asm. William Colton [D]Asm. Vivian Cook [D]
Asm. Joan Millman [D]Asm. Sandra Galef [D]Asm. Micah Kellner [D]Asm. Steven Englebright [D]
Asm. William Magnarelli [D]Asm. Aravella Simotas [D]Asm. Michelle Schimel [D]Asm. Phillip Steck [D]
Asm. Michael Benedetto [D]Asm. Nick Perry [D]Asm. Dan Quart [D]Asm. Barbara Clark [D]
Asm. Karim Camara [D]Asm. Michael Miller [D]Asm. Peter Lopez [R]Asm. Frank Skartados [D]
Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D]Asm. Mark Weprin [D]Asm. Steven Otis [D]Asm. Phillip Goldfeder [D]
Asm. Walter Mosley [D]Asm. Felix Ortiz [D]Asm. Nily Rozic [D]Asm. Alec Brook-Krasny [D]
Asm. William Scarborough [D]Asm. Marcos Crespo [D]Asm. Victor Pichardo [D]Asm. Maritza Davila [D]
Asm. Carmen Arroyo [D]Asm. Ron Kim [D]Asm. Annette Robinson [D]Asm. Brian Kavanagh [D]
Asm. Edward Braunstein [D]Asm. James Brennan [D]Asm. Anthony Brindisi [D]Asm. John Ceretto [R]
Asm. Brian Curran [R]Asm. Steven Cymbrowitz [D]Asm. Patricia Fahy [D]Asm. Herman Farrell [D]
Asm. Deborah Glick [D]Asm. Carl Heastie [D]Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D]Asm. Rhoda Jacobs [D]
Asm. Steve Katz [R]Asm. Joseph Lentol [D]Asm. Barbara Lifton [D]Asm. Margaret Markey [D]
Asm. Shelley Mayer [D]Asm. Michael Montesano [R]Asm. Catherine Nolan [D]Asm. Amy Paulin [D]
Asm. Edward Ra [R]Asm. Jose Rivera [D]Asm. Robert Rodriguez [D]Asm. Robert Sweeney [D]
Asm. Helene Weinstein [D]Asm. Harvey Weisenberg [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-03Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2014-05-22Assemblyprint number 3525e
2014-05-22Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2014-05-06Assemblyreported referred to codes
2014-05-02Assemblyprint number 3525d
2014-05-02Assemblyamend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection
2014-04-23Assemblyprint number 3525c
2014-04-23Assemblyamend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection
2014-03-05Assemblyprint number 3525b
2014-03-05Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to consumer affairs and protection
2014-01-08Assemblyreferred to consumer affairs and protection
2013-06-03Assemblydefeated in consumer affairs and protection
2013-05-09Assemblyprint number 3525a
2013-05-09Assemblyamend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection
2013-01-28Assemblyreferred to consumer affairs and protection

Same As/Similar To

S03835 (Same As) 2014-05-23 - PRINT NUMBER 3835B
S07405 (Same As) 2014-05-14 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03525&term=2013&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03525&term=2013&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03525
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03525&term=2013&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03525A
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03525&term=2013&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03525B
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03525&term=2013&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03525C
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03525&term=2013&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03525D
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03525&term=2013&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03525E

Bill Comments

feedback