NY A03525 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 64-6)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-03 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-03 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the labeling of raw agriculture commodities, processed foods, seed, and seed stock produced with genetic engineering; defines terms; imposes penalties for false labels and misbranding; sets forth exemptions.
Title
Provides for the labeling of raw agriculture commodities, processed foods, seed, and seed stock produced with genetic engineering; defines terms; imposes penalties for false labels and misbranding; sets forth exemptions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-05-22 | Assembly | print number 3525e |
2014-05-22 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2014-05-06 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-05-02 | Assembly | print number 3525d |
2014-05-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | print number 3525c |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | amend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection |
2014-03-05 | Assembly | print number 3525b |
2014-03-05 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to consumer affairs and protection |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2013-06-03 | Assembly | defeated in consumer affairs and protection |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | print number 3525a |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | amend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection |
2013-01-28 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S03835 (Same As) 2014-05-23 - PRINT NUMBER 3835B
S07405 (Same As) 2014-05-14 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
S07405 (Same As) 2014-05-14 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION