NY A11169 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the payment of the annual contributions owed and to be owed on behalf of the New York city off-track betting corporation to the New York city employees' retirement system.
Title
Provides for the payment of the annual contributions owed and to be owed on behalf of the New York city off-track betting corporation to the New York city employees' retirement system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 99 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.265 |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.265 |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S08945 (Same As) 2018-06-13 - PRINT NUMBER 8945A