NY A11157 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Legalizes, validates, ratifies and confirms certain acts and proceedings of the town board of the town of Thurman, Warren county, in relation to the issuance of obligations for the financing of alternate water supply systems for five homes as required by a consent order of the department of environmental conservation and also for a municipal building.
Title
Legalizes, validates, ratifies and confirms certain acts and proceedings of the town board of the town of Thurman, Warren county, in relation to the issuance of obligations for the financing of alternate water supply systems for five homes as required by a consent order of the department of environmental conservation and also for a municipal building.
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Stec [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | print number 11157a |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S08989 (Same As) 2018-06-18 - referred to ways and means