NY A11148 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-07-21 - amend and recommit to rules 11148a
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-07-21 - amend and recommit to rules 11148a
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
The bill would enhance and improve the reporting requirements for businesses which store or use hazardous materials.
Title
Enhances the reporting requirements for the storage or use of hazardous materials by businesses, outside of a city having a population of one million or more.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-21 | amend and recommit to rules 11148a | |
2010-06-21 | reported referred to rules | |
2010-06-03 | reported referred to codes | |
2010-05-20 | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S08162 (Same As) 2010-07-21 - PRINT NUMBER 8162A