NY A11131 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-30 - signed chap.448
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-30 - signed chap.448
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands definition of an independent worker and requirements for an eligible insurer's application.
Title
Expands definition of an independent worker and requirements for an eligible insurer's application.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-30 | signed chap.448 | |
2010-08-18 | delivered to governor | |
2010-06-18 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-18 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-06-18 | 3RD READING CAL.685 | |
2010-06-18 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7772 | |
2010-06-17 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2010-06-17 | delivered to senate | |
2010-06-17 | passed assembly | |
2010-06-17 | ordered to third reading rules cal.221 | |
2010-06-17 | rules report cal.221 | |
2010-06-17 | reported | |
2010-06-16 | reported referred to rules | |
2010-05-19 | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S07772 (Same As) 2010-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A11131