NY A11112 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s6353a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s6353a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to penalties and enforcement in the Long Island Pine Barrens maritime reserve; authorizes a police officer or peace officer to impound any all-terrain vehicle provided that such seizure is conducted pursuant to the vehicle and traffic law.
Title
Relates to penalties and enforcement in the Long Island Pine Barrens maritime reserve; authorizes a police officer or peace officer to impound any all-terrain vehicle provided that such seizure is conducted pursuant to the vehicle and traffic law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s6353a |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.464 |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S06353 (Same As) 2018-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.430