NY A11097 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-18 - substituted by s8317
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-18 - substituted by s8317
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends provisions relating to rental vehicle protections.
Title
Extends provisions relating to rental vehicle protections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s8317 |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.212 |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.212 |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S08317 (Same As) 2018-07-01 - SIGNED CHAP.108