NY A11052 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-13 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-13 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to military voters and ballots for election of members of the board of education and school district public library trustees, and the adoption of the annual budget and school district public library budget and referenda.
Title
Relates to military voters and ballots for election of members of the board of education and school district public library trustees, and the adoption of the annual budget and school district public library budget and referenda.
Sponsors
Asm. Fred Thiele [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.140 |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.140 |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-01 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S02976 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES