NY A11044 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - signed chap.258
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - signed chap.258
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the local administration of empire zones; provides an exception for the requirement to provide a certified annual report to the local zone administration board for certified businesses whose benefit period as a QEZE business enterprise has expired.
Title
Relates to the local administration of empire zones; provides an exception for the requirement to provide a certified annual report to the local zone administration board for certified businesses whose benefit period as a QEZE business enterprise has expired.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-24 | Senate | signed chap.258 |
2018-08-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.947 |
2018-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7946 |
2018-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.261 |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.261 |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S07946 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A11044