NY A11025 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-12 - ordered to third reading rules cal.139
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-12 - ordered to third reading rules cal.139
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the award of contracts to small businesses, minority-owned business enterprises and women-owned business enterprises; provides for the repeal of such provisions upon expiration thereof.
Title
Relates to the award of contracts to small businesses, minority-owned business enterprises and women-owned business enterprises; provides for the repeal of such provisions upon expiration thereof.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.139 |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.139 |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S07960 (Same As) 2018-06-21 - referred to governmental operations