NY A10922 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-6)
Status: Introduced on May 29 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s8745a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designates a portion of the state highway system in the county of Suffolk as the "Jolly 51 Memorial Bridge".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designates a portion of the state highway system in the county of Suffolk as the "Jolly 51 Memorial Bridge".

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20Assemblysubstituted by s8745a
2018-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.380
2018-06-19Assemblyrules report cal.380
2018-06-19Assemblyreported
2018-06-14Assemblyreported referred to rules
2018-06-12Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2018-05-29Assemblyreferred to transportation

Same As/Similar To

S08745 (Same As) 2018-09-20 - DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback