NY A10905 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on May 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-18 - substituted by s6650
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-18 - substituted by s6650
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the superintendent to develop a public information campaign regarding establishment of joint deposit and convenience accounts.
Title
Directs the superintendent to develop a public information campaign regarding establishment of joint deposit and convenience accounts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Banks Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Banks Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s6650 |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.198 |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.198 |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | referred to banks |
Same As/Similar To
S06650 (Same As) 2018-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.432