NY A10840 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-03 - SIGNED CHAP.134
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-03 - SIGNED CHAP.134
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends provisions regarding health care facilities and professionals providing care for persons during the COVID-19 emergency.
Title
Amends provisions regarding health care facilities and professionals providing care for persons during the COVID-19 emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-03 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.134 |
2020-07-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-23 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-07-23 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-07-23 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.352 |
2020-07-23 | Senate | substituted for a10840 |
2020-07-23 | Senate | referred to codes |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1033 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | substituted by s8835 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.352 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | rules report cal.352 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S08835 (Same As) 2020-08-03 - SIGNED CHAP.134