NY A10832 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Makes an appropriation to the account for payment of services and expenses related to the administration of the New York state and local employees' retirement system and the New York state and local police and fire retirement system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes an appropriation to the account for payment of services and expenses related to the administration of the New York state and local employees' retirement system and the New York state and local police and fire retirement system.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21Senatetabled
2018-12-21Senatevetoed memo.306
2018-12-11Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-18SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-18Senate3RD READING CAL.1891
2018-06-18SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S8871
2018-06-11SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-11Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-11Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-07Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.72
2018-06-07Assemblyrules report cal.72
2018-06-06Assemblyreported
2018-06-05Assemblyreported referred to rules
2018-05-22Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S08871 (Same As) 2018-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10832

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10832&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10832&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A10832
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10832&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10832&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10832&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A10832#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback