NY A10798 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-20 - ordered to third reading rules cal.218
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-20 - ordered to third reading rules cal.218
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires contractors and subcontractors to disclose the existence of property and casualty insurance before they begin work on a home.
Title
Requires contractors and subcontractors to disclose the existence of property and casualty insurance before they begin work on a home.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.218 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.218 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-10 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S08769 (Same As) 2020-07-15 - REFERRED TO RULES