NY A10772 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-15 - signed chap.197
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-15 - signed chap.197
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
This bill would clarify that private veterinarians and veterinary tech- nicians serving the State as part of an activated Emergency Veterinary Medical Corps are not prohibited from appearing before the Department of Agriculture and Markets (Department) following such service.
Title
Authorizes persons who held temporary employment by the New York State department of agriculture and markets as a veterinarian one or animal health inspector one as a member of the emergency veterinary corps to appear or practice before a state agency within two years of the termination of such employment.
Sponsors
Asm. Ro Ann Destito [D] | Asm. Dennis Gabryszak [D] | Asm. Sandra Galef [D] | Asm. Aileen Gunther [D] |
Asm. David Koon [D] | Asm. William Magee [D] | Asm. John McEneny [D] | Asm. Joan Millman [D] |
Asm. Robert Reilly [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-15 | signed chap.197 | |
2010-07-08 | delivered to governor | |
2010-06-17 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-17 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-06-14 | 3RD READING CAL.792 | |
2010-06-14 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7417 | |
2010-06-10 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | |
2010-06-10 | delivered to senate | |
2010-06-10 | passed assembly | |
2010-04-29 | advanced to third reading cal.833 | |
2010-04-27 | reported | |
2010-04-21 | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S07417 (Same As) 2010-06-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10772